This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 16:47:11 (UTC).

Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services, et al Plaintiff vs. Russia Nicholas Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Camelot Property Management Real Estate Services, Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Russia Nicholas Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4988

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chang, Xiao M

Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services

Defendant

Nicholas, Russia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Worman, Robert M

1200 S Pine Island Road, Suite 220

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Served

5/24/2019 - Writ of Possession Returned Served

eWrit Issuance - Possession

4/23/2019 - eWrit Issuance - Possession

Summons Served-Posted

4/18/2019 - Summons Served-Posted

Motion for Default & Default

4/18/2019 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

4/18/2019 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Non-Military Affidavit

4/18/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Certificate of Mailing

4/9/2019 - Certificate of Mailing

Complaint (eFiled)

4/8/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

4/8/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

4/8/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Final Judgment for Eviction

4/23/2019 - Final Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Served; 05-09-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment for Eviction; Comment (COUNT I ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115756112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeWrit Issuance - Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; April 10, 2019; Party: Defendant Nicholas, Russia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; Party: Plaintiff Chang, Xiao M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A050037; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A050037; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services is a litigant