This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 19:02:50 (UTC).

Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services, et al Plaintiff vs. Rita Finklin Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Camelot Property Management Real Estate Services, Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Rita Finklin Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1257

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SNR Investments and Rentals" LLC"

Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services

Defendant

Finklin, Rita

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Worman, Robert M

1200 S Pine Island Road, Suite 220

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

eWrit Issuance - Possession

1/30/2020 - eWrit Issuance - Possession

Motion for Default & Default

1/29/2020 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

1/29/2020 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Summons Returned Served

1/25/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Non-Military Affidavit

1/25/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Certificate of Mailing

1/22/2020 - Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

1/21/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

1/21/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

1/21/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Default Judgment for Eviction

1/30/2020 - Default Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Judgment for Eviction; Comment (-Count I ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116319950

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeWrit Issuance - Possession; Party: Defendant Finklin, Rita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Party: Defendant Finklin, Rita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 01-21-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $810.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services is a litigant