This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 14:53:19 (UTC).

Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services, et al Plaintiff vs. Paulette Karesia Whitter Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 Camelot Property Management Real Estate Services, Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Paulette Karesia Whitter Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4302

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SNR Investments and Rentals" LLC"

Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services

Defendant

Whitter, Paulette Karesia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Worman, Robert M

1200 S Pine Island Road, Suite 220

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Served

5/24/2019 - Writ of Possession Returned Served

Returned Mail Undeliverable

5/13/2019 - Returned Mail Undeliverable

Motion to Stay Writ of Possession

4/25/2019 - Motion to Stay Writ of Possession

Order Denying Motion to Stay Writ

4/25/2019 - Order Denying Motion to Stay Writ

eWrit Issuance - Possession

4/18/2019 - eWrit Issuance - Possession

Order Disbursing Funds

4/17/2019 - Order Disbursing Funds

Mediation Report

4/15/2019 - Mediation Report

Motion for Judgment on Pleadings

4/14/2019 - Motion for Judgment on Pleadings

Motion for Disbursement

4/14/2019 - Motion for Disbursement

Order Referring Case to Mediation

4/1/2019 - Order Referring Case to Mediation

Copy of Receipt

3/29/2019 - Copy of Receipt

Summons Returned Served

3/27/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

3/27/2019 - Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

Non-Military Affidavit

3/27/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Certificate of Mailing

3/20/2019 - Certificate of Mailing

eSummons Issuance

3/19/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

3/18/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Final Judgment for Eviction

4/17/2019 - Final Judgment for Eviction

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Served; 05-07-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable; sent to correct address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketFunds Disbursed Per Ord; To Pl $2113.00 Ck# 100839

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Stay Writ of Possession; Party: Defendant Whitter, Paulette Karesia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying Motion to Stay Writ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketPleadings Sent Up To Judge; Motion to Stay Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeWrit Issuance - Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115745915

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Disbursing Funds; in court reg to pltfs forthwith

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Defendant's Answer; and TO STRIKE AND FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION/POSSESSION; Party: Plaintiff SNR Investments and Rentals" LLC"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketComment:; Answer retd from Judge--No action taken by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Tenant Eviction; /x

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A040179; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A040179; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services is a litigant