This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/05/2020 at 13:15:06 (UTC).

Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services, et al Plaintiff vs. Joshua Lahee, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 Camelot Property Management Real Estate Services, Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Joshua Lahee, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7370

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SNR Investments and Rentals" LLC"

Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services

Defendants

Lahee, Joshua

Morgan, Kelly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Worman, Robert M

1200 S Pine Island Road, Suite 220

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

eWrit Issuance - Possession

8/8/2018 - eWrit Issuance - Possession

Motion for Default & Default

8/3/2018 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

8/3/2018 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Summons Returned Served

7/30/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

7/30/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Non-Military Affidavit

7/30/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Certificate of Mailing

7/25/2018 - Certificate of Mailing

Complaint (eFiled)

7/24/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

7/24/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

7/24/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/24/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Final Judgment for Eviction

8/7/2018 - Final Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeWrit Issuance - Possession; Party: Plaintiff Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment for Eviction; Comment (COUNT 1 ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115250556

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Count 1 Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; count 1 only; Party: Plaintiff Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services; Party: Plaintiff SNR Investments and Rentals" LLC"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 07/26/2018; Party: Defendant Lahee, Joshua

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 07/26/2018; Party: Defendant Morgan, Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Lahee, Joshua

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Morgan, Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A100121; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A100121; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A100121; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services is a litigant