This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/06/2020 at 00:21:39 (UTC).

C U Inc Plaintiff vs. Roosevelt Lekirk Williams Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 C U Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Roosevelt Lekirk Williams Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7826

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C U Inc

Defendant

Williams, Roosevelt Lekirk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tepps, Jerome L, ESQ.

Attorney at Jerome L. Tepps, PA

4300 N. University Drive, Suite C-102

Sunrise, FL 33351

 

Court Documents

Order Disbursing Funds

10/1/2018 - Order Disbursing Funds

Directions to the Clerk

10/1/2018 - Directions to the Clerk

Notice of Hearing

9/24/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Motion for Rehearing

9/24/2018 - Motion for Rehearing

Copy of Receipt

9/24/2018 - Copy of Receipt

Notice of Hearing

9/12/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Copy of Receipt

8/31/2018 - Copy of Receipt

Order Requiring Rent Money Into Ct Reg

8/24/2018 - Order Requiring Rent Money Into Ct Reg

Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

8/15/2018 - Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

Notice of Hearing By Judge

8/15/2018 - Notice of Hearing By Judge

Answer to Tenant Eviction

8/13/2018 - Answer to Tenant Eviction

Summons Returned Served

8/8/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Certificate of Mailing

8/6/2018 - Certificate of Mailing

Complaint (eFiled)

8/1/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

8/1/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

8/1/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

12/19/2018 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115513614

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketFunds Disbursed Per Ord; PL $2312.00 Ck#97911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Disbursing Funds; Monies in the Ct Reg to be disburset to Pltf's Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDirections to the Clerk; Other: order of disbursement of funds in court register and dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketRent Receipt; Payor: ROOSEVELT WILLIAMS ; Userid: CTS-bvolcy ; Receipt: 20183YF3E001334; Comments: SEPT 2018 RENT RECEIPT ; Amount: $1,120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCourt Registry Clerk's Fee; Payor: ROOSEVELT WILLIAMS ; Userid: CTS-bvolcy ; Receipt: 20183YF3E001334; Comments: SEPT 2018 RENT RECEIPT ; Amount: $25.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Rehearing; /x; Party: Defendant Williams, Roosevelt Lekirk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Receipt; september 2018 rent receipt /x

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Defendant's Answer; Party: Plaintiff C U Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing By Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Tenant Eviction; X; Party: Defendant Williams, Roosevelt Lekirk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; August 6, 2018; Party: Defendant Williams, Roosevelt Lekirk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JEROME L TEPPS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A104453; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JEROME L TEPPS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A104453; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C U Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tepps, Jerome L, ESQ.