This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/04/2020 at 18:52:05 (UTC).

C U Inc Plaintiff vs. Margaret Grace Mason Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 C U Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Margaret Grace Mason Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2580

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C U Inc

Defendant

Mason, Margaret Grace

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Treco, William A

4300 N University Dr, Ste C-102

Sunrise, FL 33351

 

Court Documents

Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment

2/18/2020 - Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment

Non-Military Affidavit

2/18/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default & Default

2/14/2020 - Motion for Default & Default

Notice of Filing

2/12/2020 - Notice of Filing

Certificate of Mailing

2/6/2020 - Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

2/3/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

2/3/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

2/3/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

2/3/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Final Judgment for Eviction

2/27/2020 - Final Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116382273

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Entry of Default Final Judgment; Party: Plaintiff C U Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Party: Defendant Mason, Margaret Grace

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE AND SUMMONS/POSTED 2-6-20; Party: Defendant Mason, Margaret Grace

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C U Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Treco, William A