This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 20:43:40 (UTC).

Broward Outpatient Medical Center Plaintiff vs. Geico Indemnity Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Broward Outpatient Medical Center Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico Indemnity Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3012

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broward Outpatient Medical Center

Wilcox, Jesse

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thompson, Steven J

Attorney at Thompson Legal, P.A.

5989 Stirling Rd.

Davie, FL 33314

Defendant Attorneys

Cimballa, George L, III

Attorney at Law Office of George Cimballa 111, ESQ

8151 Peters Rd, Suite 3300

Plantation, FL 33324

Baez, Michelle M

Attorney at The Law Office of George L. Cimballa III

6700 North Andres Avenue, Suite 404

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Agreed Order

2/12/2020 - Agreed Order

Notice of Cancellation

2/10/2020 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Hearing

1/8/2020 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

12/4/2019 - Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

Agreed Order Granting

12/2/2019 - Agreed Order Granting

Motion for Leave to Amend

11/26/2019 - Motion for Leave to Amend

Motion to Compel

10/2/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Enforce

9/26/2019 - Motion to Enforce

Motion to Compel

8/5/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Extension of Time

7/29/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response

7/19/2019 - Response

Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses

7/16/2019 - Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses

Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses

7/16/2019 - Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses

Request for Admissions

6/25/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogs

6/25/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Production

6/25/2019 - Request for Production

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/20/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/20/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; Plaintiffs Motion to Strike First Affirmative Defense is GRANTED without leave to amend and pls mo/strike 2nd affirm defense/denied and mo/strike 3rd affirm/granted and mo/compel depo/granted and mo/enforce ord compelling interrogs ans is deemed moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Party: Defendant Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order Granting; Agreed Order on Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer (Granted.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Leave to Amend; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Party: Defendant Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; DEPOSITION OF LITIGATION ADJUSTER WITH THE MOST KNOWLEDGE; Party: Plaintiff Broward Outpatient Medical Center

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default; /Judicial; Party: Plaintiff Broward Outpatient Medical Center

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 80 Levine, Olga; Location: West Courtroom 220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: STEVE THOMPSON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A025797; Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: STEVE THOMPSON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A025797; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Broward Outpatient Medical Center LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHELLE BAEZ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George L Cimballa