This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2021 at 22:32:55 (UTC).

Broward County Plaintiff vs. Miguel Sarminento, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/17/2015 Broward County Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Miguel Sarminento, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lopane, Nicholas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0358

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lopane, Nicholas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Broward County

Defendants

BancBoston Mortgage Corp

First Franklin Financial Corp

Inverrary Gardens Condo Assn Inc

Mendez, Silvia H

Sarminento, Miguel

Wells Fargo NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kitchner, Carl L, ESQ.

Attorney at Broward County Attorney

Governmental Center Suite 423, 115 South Andrews Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

Canter, Steven M

Attorney at Tucker and Tighe, PA

800 East Broward Blvd., Suite 710

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

1/17/2019 - Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

Motion to Vacate

10/16/2017 - Motion to Vacate

Motion

4/26/2017 - Motion

Notice of Hearing

4/3/2017 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

11/10/2016 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Compel

11/7/2016 - Motion to Compel

eSummons Issuance

4/22/2016 - eSummons Issuance

Notice to Deposit Money Into Court Registry

3/29/2016 - Notice to Deposit Money Into Court Registry

Motion for Default & Default

1/28/2016 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion

1/15/2016 - Motion

Summons Returned Served

1/15/2016 - Summons Returned Served

Answer

12/21/2015 - Answer

Summons Returned Served

11/24/2015 - Summons Returned Served

eSummons Issuance (No Fee)

11/18/2015 - eSummons Issuance (No Fee)

eSummons Issuance

11/17/2015 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

11/17/2015 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

11/17/2015 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

11/17/2015 - Civil Cover Sheet

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Order of Dismissal; Comment (Lack of Prosecution ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 115817955

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDirections to Clerk-Disposed; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115820881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCircuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketCheck Paid; to Tucker & Tighe PA Tr Acct per ord ($24,232.73) mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketVoided Check; #90264 $500.00 payable to Broward Cty. Entire amount to be paid to defendant per ord 10/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder; Comment (of Disbursement of Tax Deed Surplus and Directions to Clerk of Court (Agreed Final Order) ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 3 Pages; Instrument Number: 114670796

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGood Faith Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Vacate; COUNTY'S MOTION TO VACATE AGREED ORDER TO RETURN $500.00 IN TAX DEED SURPLUS FUNDS TO COUNTY; Party: Plaintiff Broward County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Wells Fargo NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Inverrary Gardens Condo Assn Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: CARL L KITCHNER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A167232; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: CARL L KITCHNER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A167232; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: CARL L KITCHNER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A167232; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: CARL L KITCHNER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A167232; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: CARL L KITCHNER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A167232; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: CARL L KITCHNER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A167232; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); for Interpleader; Party: Plaintiff Broward County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Inverrary Gardens Condo Assn Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BancBoston Mortgage Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where WELLS FARGO NA REGISTERED AGENT OR OWNER CORPORATION SERVICE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where First Franklin Financial Corp is a litigant