This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/25/2020 at 13:33:28 (UTC).

Boywic Farms Ltd Plaintiff vs. Red Wing Electric LLC Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Boywic Farms Ltd Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Red Wing Electric LLC Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kanner, Daniel J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2927

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kanner, Daniel J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boywic Farms Ltd

Defendant

Red Wing Electric LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin, Robert

Attorney at Martin & Martin P.A.

319 Se 14Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

 

Court Documents

Final Disposition Form

4/24/2019 - Final Disposition Form

Joint Stipulation

3/28/2019 - Joint Stipulation

Motion for Default & Default

3/8/2019 - Motion for Default & Default

Affidavit of Service

3/8/2019 - Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

2/27/2019 - Affidavit of Service

Civil Cover Sheet

1/22/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

1/22/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

1/22/2019 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

eSummons Issuance

1/22/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

4/24/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

Order Approving Settlement

4/4/2019 - Order Approving Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 115759282

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder Approving Settlement; Comment (AGREED ORDER STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 115722896

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Stipulation; FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Party: Defendant Red Wing Electric LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Corporate Service-Frankie Lopez;/General manager 02/15/2019; Party: Defendant Red Wing Electric LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Sums Svd 2-15-19; Party: Defendant Red Wing Electric LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ROBERT C. MARTIN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A014784; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT C. MARTIN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A014784; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less