This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 07/04/2020 at 23:06:44 (UTC).

Bonnie Properties LLC Plaintiff vs. Theolinda Fabien Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 Bonnie Properties LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Theolinda Fabien Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohen, Mardi Levey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1282

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cohen, Mardi Levey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bonnie Properties LLC

Defendant

Fabien, Theolinda

 

Court Documents

Summons Served-Posted

6/3/2020 - Summons Served-Posted

eSummons Issuance

5/27/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Affidavit of Compliance

5/27/2020 - Affidavit of Compliance

Civil Cover Sheet

5/27/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

5/27/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 1st day of June, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1,658.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bonnie Properties LLC is a litigant