This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 01/26/2021 at 17:41:35 (UTC).

Bonnie Properties LLC Plaintiff vs. Scott LaPerriere Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/17/2015 Bonnie Properties LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Scott LaPerriere Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barner, Florence Taylor. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5586

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barner, Florence Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bonnie Properties LLC

Defendant

LaPerriere, Scott

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

3/26/2015 - Summons Returned Served

Non-Military Affidavit

3/26/2015 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

3/26/2015 - Motion for Default

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

3/26/2015 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Civil Cover Sheet

3/17/2015 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/17/2015 - Complaint

Default Judgment for Eviction

3/31/2015 - Default Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 112915054

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to Plaintiff; Pickup on 4/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; x; Party: Plaintiff Bonnie Properties LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default; x; Party: Plaintiff Bonnie Properties LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; x; Party: Plaintiff Bonnie Properties LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketFile Created for SRS Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: AMERICAN COASTAL REALTY I ; Userid: CTS-jjohnson ; Receipt: 20151YF1E000444; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: AMERICAN COASTAL REALTY I ; Userid: CTS-jjohnson ; Receipt: 20151YF1E000444; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued to Process Server; Combo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bonnie Properties LLC is a litigant