This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 11/18/2020 at 02:59:55 (UTC).

Boan Investments II LLC Plaintiff vs. Realty Income Corp Defendant

Case Summary

On 10/27/2016 Boan Investments II LLC Plaintiff filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against Realty Income Corp Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perlman, Sandra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9779

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perlman, Sandra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boan Investments II LLC

Defendants

Realty Income Corp

Realty Income Properties Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glazer, Ari J

800 Corporate Dr., Ste. 510

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33334-0000

Defendant Attorney

Chait, Matthew

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen. LLP

525 Okeechobee Boulevard, Suite 1100

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

Certificate

9/6/2019 - Certificate

Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

11/16/2018 - Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

Order Extending Time

9/26/2018 - Order Extending Time

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

9/25/2018 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Extension of Time

9/25/2018 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order

9/14/2018 - Order

Notice of Cancellation

9/5/2018 - Notice of Cancellation

Agreed Order

9/5/2018 - Agreed Order

Notice of Hearing

8/23/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Motion for Leave to File

8/21/2018 - Motion for Leave to File

Request for Production

8/21/2018 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

5/11/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Production of Documents

3/21/2018 - Request for Production of Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogs

3/21/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

12/13/2016 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Summons Returned Served

11/4/2016 - Summons Returned Served

Complaint (eFiled)

10/27/2016 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

10/27/2016 - eSummons Issuance

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; OF AUTHORITY; Party: Plaintiff Boan Investments II LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Set Case for Trial; Party: Plaintiff Boan Investments II LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Extending Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Party: Plaintiff Boan Investments II LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production of Documents; TO DEFENDANT; Party: Plaintiff Boan Investments II LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; ON DEFENDANT; Party: Plaintiff Boan Investments II LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND OTHER RELIEF; Party: Defendant Realty Income Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Realty Income Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 11-01-2016; Party: Defendant Realty Income Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); For Declaratory and Other Relief; Party: Plaintiff Boan Investments II LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; REALTY INCOME CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: MICHAEL W MOSKOWITZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A152332; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MICHAEL W MOSKOWITZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A152332; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REALTY INCOME CORPORATION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where REALTY INCOME PROPERTIES INC is a litigant