This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/17/2023 at 11:11:24 (UTC).

BOA Partnership LP Plaintiff vs. Terrick Shim, etal Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 BOA Partnership LP Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Terrick Shim, etal Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hurley, John. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1018

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hurley, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOA Partnership LP

The Waves Apartments

Defendants

Shim, Terrick

Evans, Aque

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCain, Ryan R

Attorney at Barfield McCain PA

4460 Medical Center Way

West Palm Beach, FL 33407

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

2/2/2023 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/2/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

2/2/2023 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/2/2023 - eSummons Issuance

Certificate of Mailing

2/8/2023 - Certificate of Mailing

Summons Returned Served

2/13/2023 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

2/13/2023 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

2/13/2023 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

2/13/2023 - Summons Returned Served

Non-Military Affidavit

2/17/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

2/17/2023 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Default

2/17/2023 - Default

Motion for Default

2/17/2023 - Motion for Default

Default Judgment for Eviction

2/22/2023 - Default Judgment for Eviction

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Writ of Possession Issued to BSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Default Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 2; Instrument Number: 118694499

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Default; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff BOA Partnership LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Non-Military Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; POSTED 9th day of February, 2023; Party: Defendant Evans, Aque

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; POSTED 02/09/2023; Party: Defendant Evans, Aque

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; POSTED 9th day of February, 2023; Party: Defendant Shim, Terrick

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; POSTED 02/09/2023; Party: Defendant Shim, Terrick

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Evans, Aque

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Shim, Terrick

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less