This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 11/07/2022 at 21:11:50 (UTC).

Blue Steel Construction Roofing Inc Plaintiff vs. John Parker Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 Blue Steel Construction Roofing Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against John Parker Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hurley, John. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6065

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hurley, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blue Steel Construction Roofing Inc

Defendant

Parker, John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baros, Grant A, Jr.

2500 N. Military Trl, Suite 303

Boca Raton, FL 33431-6324

Defendant Attorney

Gottlieb, Brian D

3333 W. Commercial Blvd, Suite 200B

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

10/19/2022 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Lis Pendens

9/16/2022 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Complaint (eFiled)

9/16/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

9/16/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

9/19/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Appearance

10/6/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Dismiss

10/10/2022 - Motion to Dismiss

Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

10/17/2022 - Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 118469112

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; COUNTS II-IV, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AS TO COUNT II; Party: Defendant Parker, John

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Parker, John

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Parker, John

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined Streamlined

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $8,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Fld & Rec

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less