This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/25/2020 at 17:08:53 (UTC).

Blue Lake Villas Owner LLC Plaintiff vs. Shana La Beet, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Blue Lake Villas Owner LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Shana La Beet, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Robert W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2028

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Robert W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blue Lake Villas Owner LLC

Defendants

Sydney, Philippe

La Beet, Shana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowenhaupt, Kenneth James, ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Lowenhaupt Sawyers and Spinale

7765 Sw 87Th Avenue, Suite 201

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

Motion for Order

2/10/2020 - Motion for Order

Stipulation for-of Settlement

2/10/2020 - Stipulation for-of Settlement

Summons Served-Posted

2/4/2020 - Summons Served-Posted

Summons Served-Posted

2/4/2020 - Summons Served-Posted

Certificate of Mailing

1/30/2020 - Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

1/24/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

1/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

1/24/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Stipulation & Order of Dismissal

2/13/2020 - Stipulation & Order of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionStipulation & Order of Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116350915

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Order; FOR AN ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL; Party: Plaintiff Blue Lake Villas Owner LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for-of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 1/31/2020; Party: Defendant La Beet, Shana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 1/31/2020; Party: Defendant Sydney, Philippe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; (BOTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant La Beet, Shana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Sydney, Philippe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less