This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:32:54 (UTC).

Bazil Pierre Louis Plaintiff vs. Kristen Jackson , et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Bazil Pierre Louis Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Kristen Jackson , Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perlman, Sandra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5710

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perlman, Sandra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pierre Louis , Bazil

Defendants

Jackson, Kenrick

Jackson , Kristen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis, Derek Alex

Attorney at The Injury Firm

1608 E Commerical Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33334-5719

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Service of Interrogs

9/23/2020 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Production

9/23/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Service of Interrogs

9/23/2020 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Production

9/23/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $75,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; KRISTEN JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; TO DEFENDANT, KRISTEN JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT, KRISTEN JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANT, KRISTEN JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; KENRICK JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; TO DEFENDANT, KENRICK JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT, KENRICK JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANT, KENRICK JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less