This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/14/2020 at 17:58:26 (UTC).

Bayview Loan Servicing LLC Plaintiff vs. Dev Kumar Thappla, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 Bayview Loan Servicing LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Dev Kumar Thappla, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2950

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bayview Loan Servicing LLC

Defendants

Sharma, Hina N

Thappla, Dev Kumar

Cypress Head Club Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Deluca, Orlando

 

Court Documents

Final Disposition Form

7/3/2019 - Final Disposition Form

Certificate of Service

3/20/2019 - Certificate of Service

Order Placing Case on Inactive Status

3/12/2019 - Order Placing Case on Inactive Status

Motion for Continuance

3/11/2019 - Motion for Continuance

Certificate of Service

9/19/2018 - Certificate of Service

Witness & Exhibit List

9/19/2018 - Witness & Exhibit List

Order Setting

9/11/2018 - Order Setting

Order Granting Motion to Strike

9/11/2018 - Order Granting Motion to Strike

Order Setting

9/11/2018 - Order Setting

Notice of Hearing

9/7/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Motion

9/6/2018 - Motion

Amended Witness List

5/18/2018 - Amended Witness List

Witness & Exhibit List

3/22/2018 - Witness & Exhibit List

Certificate of Service

3/22/2018 - Certificate of Service

Order Setting

3/8/2018 - Order Setting

Notice to Set Case for Trial

2/15/2018 - Notice to Set Case for Trial

Non-Military Affidavit

1/31/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default & Default

1/31/2018 - Motion for Default & Default

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 115916087

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; Party: Plaintiff Bayview Loan Servicing LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Placing Case on Inactive Status

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Party: Plaintiff Bayview Loan Servicing LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; ORDER SETTING NON-JURY; Party: Plaintiff Bayview Loan Servicing LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWitness & Exhibit List; Party: Plaintiff Bayview Loan Servicing LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting; NON-JURY FORECLOSURE TRIAL AND PRETRIAL PROCEDURES ON 3/12/18 @ 9:00 AM RM 4150

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ISSUED ON: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ORLANDO DELUCA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A173222; Amount: $1,906.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketDefendant Count > than 5; Payor: ORLANDO DELUCA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A173222; Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ORLANDO DELUCA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A173222; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ORLANDO DELUCA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A173222; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ORLANDO DELUCA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A173222; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ORLANDO DELUCA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A173222; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ORLANDO DELUCA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A173222; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ORLANDO DELUCA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A173222; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ORLANDO DELUCA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A173222; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less