This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/10/2020 at 13:40:23 (UTC).

Banyan Club East LLC Plaintiff vs. Miguel Antonio Matute Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Banyan Club East LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Miguel Antonio Matute Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Di Pietro, Nina W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2361

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Di Pietro, Nina W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Banyan Club East LLC

Defendant

Matute, Miguel Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowenhaupt, Kenneth James, ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Lowenhaupt Sawyers and Spinale

7765 Sw 87Th Avenue, Suite 201

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

1/28/2019 - Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

1/22/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

1/22/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

1/22/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Voluntary Dismissal W/O Prejudice

2/1/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal W/O Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionVoluntary Dismissal W/O Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115592568

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Party: Defendant Matute, Miguel Antonio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A011757; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A011757; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less