This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/16/2020 at 02:38:40 (UTC).

Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA Plaintiff vs. USA on behalf of the Secretary of HUD , et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against USA on behalf of the Secretary of HUD , Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9382

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA

for Mortgage Assets Management Series I Trust

Defendants

Coplon, Helen

Coplon, Edward

Sunrise Lakes Condominium Apts Phase 3 Inc

USA on behalf of the Secretary of HUD

Popular Bank

Coplon, Helen E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hyppolite, Ruthamar, ESQ.

Attorney at QUINTAIROS, PRIETO, WOOD & BOYER, P.A.

1 E Broward Blvd, Suite 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1842

Blake, Veroneque A

Attorney at Robertson, Anshutz & Schneid, P.L.

6409 Congress Ave, Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Buzgon, Sophie I

Attorney at Blade & Blade, P.A.

515 S. Federal Highway

Deerfield Beach, FL 33441-4109

Manswell, Wendy C

Attorney at Robertson, Anschutz & Schneid, P.L

6409 Congress Avenue, Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

Frank, Neil G

7805 Sw 6Th Ct

Plantation, FL 33324-3203

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Service

5/19/2020 - Certificate of Service

Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial

5/18/2020 - Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial

Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial

3/23/2020 - Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial

Notice of Filing

3/14/2020 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Intent

3/4/2020 - Notice of Intent

Certificate of Service

2/28/2020 - Certificate of Service

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

2/27/2020 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage

2/27/2020 - Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage

Certificate of Service

2/27/2020 - Certificate of Service

Value Claim Form

4/30/2019 - Value Claim Form

Notice of Lis Pendens

4/30/2019 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Certificate

4/30/2019 - Certificate

Complaint (eFiled)

4/30/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

4/30/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

4/30/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

4/30/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

4/30/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

4/30/2019 - eSummons Issuance

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; OF ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrd Setting Non-Jury Trial; 07-29-2020 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrd Setting Non-Jury Trial; 05-19-2020 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketComment:; FILE CREATED FOR ORIGINAL DOCS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of Filing Original Note & Mortgage; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; OF ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; Certification of Possession; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; EDWARD COPLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; POPULAR BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; SUNRISE LAKES CONDOMINIUM APTS., PHASE 3, INC. 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where For Mortgage Assets Management Series 1 Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where Popular Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Sunrise Lakes Condominium Apts Phase 3 Inc 3 is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant