This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/13/2020 at 22:59:39 (UTC).

Bank of New York Mellon Plaintiff vs. Rachamin L Assayag, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Bank of New York Mellon Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Rachamin L Assayag, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7388

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bank of New York Mellon

Bank of New York

CWMBS (2004-25)

Defendants

Assayag, Rachamin L

Assayag, Rachamim Z

Asayag, Rami Z

Homes at East Lake Homeowners Assoc Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Deluca, Orlando

Attorney at Deluca Law Group, PLLC

2101 Ne 26Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33305

Defendant Attorneys

Hagen, Kevin L, ESQ.

Attorney at Nation Lawyers

10251 W Oakland Park Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33312

Seiden, Jeffrey M, ESQ.

Attorney at Choice legal Group P.A.

P.O. Box 771270

Coral Springs, FL 33077

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

6/4/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Cancellation

3/30/2020 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Hearing

3/26/2020 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

3/4/2020 - Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

2/1/2020 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Certificate of Service

1/8/2020 - Certificate of Service

Notice of Hearing

12/19/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Motion for Mediation

12/18/2019 - Motion for Mediation

Civil Cover Sheet

4/4/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

4/4/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

4/4/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

4/4/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

4/4/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

4/4/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Lis Pendens

4/4/2019 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Complaint (eFiled)

4/4/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

4/4/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Order

1/7/2020 - Order

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; to respond to discovery; Party: Defendant Assayag, Rachamin L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Defendant's Answer; WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant Assayag, Rachamin L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; Order Attchd; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder; Comment (ON (i) DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ABATE and (ii) DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 116279110

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Mediation; Party: Defendant Assayag, Rachamin L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; RACHAMIN L. ASSAYAG A/K/A RACHAMIM Z. ASSAYAG A/K/A RAMI Z. ASAYAG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; THE HOMES AT EAST LAKE HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RACHAMIN L. ASSAYAG A/K/A RACHAMIM ASSAYAG A/K/A RAMI Z. ASAYAG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); VERIFIED COMI'LAINT FOR FORECLOSURE; Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less