This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 16:57:15 (UTC).

Bank of America N.A. Plaintiff vs. Karina C Reid Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 Bank of America N A Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Karina C Reid Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1786

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America N.A.

Defendant

Reid, Karina C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Winter, Robert A

Attorney at Cooling & Winter

7901 Sw 6Th Court, Suite 310

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Gomez, Alejandro Emilio

11 Broadway, Suite 1515

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

Settlement Agreement

3/21/2019 - Settlement Agreement

Notice of Hearing By Judge

3/20/2019 - Notice of Hearing By Judge

Motion for Order to Show Cause

3/8/2019 - Motion for Order to Show Cause

Motion for Extension of Time

3/8/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

3/8/2019 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Motion for Summary Judgment

3/8/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Affidavit of Costs

3/8/2019 - Affidavit of Costs

County - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

2/15/2019 - County - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/10/2018 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Summons Returned Served

3/27/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Complaint (eFiled)

2/5/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

2/5/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Civil Cover Sheet

2/5/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

2/5/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Order Approving Settlement

3/26/2019 - Order Approving Settlement

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder Approving Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSettlement Agreement; Party: Plaintiff Bank of America N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing By Judge; April 1, 2019, at 2:20 p.m

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Order to Show Cause; Party: Plaintiff Bank of America N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; ....to submit a Motion for Summary Judgment...; Party: Plaintiff Bank of America N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Party: Plaintiff Bank of America N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCounty - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant Reid, Karina C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 3/21/18; Party: Defendant Reid, Karina C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Reid, Karina C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ROBERT WINTER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A017996; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT WINTER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A017996; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less