This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 19:51:21 (UTC).

Aventura Orthopedicare Center PA Plaintiff vs. Progressive American Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/10/2018 Aventura Orthopedicare Center PA Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Progressive American Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1922

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aventura Orthopedicare Center PA

Lopez, Javier

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daly, John C, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of John C. Daly PA

8551 W. Sunrise Blvd., Ste#304

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant Attorneys

Cameron, Jessica Marie

Attorney at Progressive PIP House Counsel

3230 W Commercial Blvd, Suite 400

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

Whitebook, Erin Grachow

3230 West Commercial Blvd, Suite 400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

10/22/2019 - Notice of Settlement

Notice of Mediation

9/17/2019 - Notice of Mediation

Notice of Filing

9/13/2019 - Notice of Filing

Objection

9/11/2019 - Objection

Order Vacating

8/12/2019 - Order Vacating

Order Referring Case to Mediation

8/7/2019 - Order Referring Case to Mediation

Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

8/7/2019 - Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

Response to Request for Admissions

8/6/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Hearing By Judge

8/6/2019 - Notice of Hearing By Judge

Notice of Filing Deposition

7/25/2019 - Notice of Filing Deposition

Request for Production

7/25/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

7/25/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogs

7/25/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

County - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

6/25/2019 - County - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

Motion for Extension of Time

4/13/2018 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/26/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

3/22/2018 - Notice of Appearance

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/10/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116234059

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder of Dismissal; Comment (Reservation of Jurisdiction to Enforce Terms of The Settlement ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116134302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery; RESPONSES; Party: Plaintiff Aventura Orthopedicare Center PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Party: Defendant Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; expert witness list; Party: Defendant Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing By Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; to Pl's Req for Judicial Notice of Fla Statue; Party: Defendant Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclosure of Expert Witness

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCounty - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 80 Levine, Olga; Location: West Courtroom 220; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Party: Defendant Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JOHN C DALY JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021444; Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN C DALY JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021444; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aventura Orthopedicare Center PA is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMERON , JESSICA M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whitebook, Erin G, ESQ.