This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/01/2020 at 00:46:47 (UTC).

Autovest Financial Services LLC Plaintiff vs. Princess Gooding Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 Autovest Financial Services LLC Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Princess Gooding Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohen, Mardi Levey. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8891

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cohen, Mardi Levey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Autovest Financial Services LLC

Defendant

Gooding, Princess

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Order Setting Case Management Conference

4/30/2019 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Summons Returned Unserved

12/19/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved

Complaint (eFiled)

8/16/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

8/16/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

8/16/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

eSummons Issuance

8/16/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

7/15/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

7/12/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

Voluntary Dismissal W/O Prejudice

7/10/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal W/O Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

07/15/2019
View Court Documents

DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115928621

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2019
View Court Documents

DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115928319

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2019
View Court Documents

DispositionVoluntary Dismissal W/O Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115920669

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2019

DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; 07-22-2019 1:30 PM Rm# 13164

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2018

DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: APLS PLLC, IOLTA COST ACCOUNT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A112524; Amount: $300.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2018

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: APLS PLLC, IOLTA COST ACCOUNT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A112524; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2018
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint (eFiled)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2018
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance

[+] Read More [-] Read Less