This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 19:53:12 (UTC).

Associates MD PVC LLC Plaintiff vs. Progressive American Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/10/2018 Associates MD PVC LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Progressive American Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1924

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Associates MD PVC LLC

Lucien, Rosemene

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daly, John C, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of John C. Daly PA

8551 W. Sunrise Blvd., Ste#304

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

Hirshberg, Geoff, ESQ.

Attorney at Progressive PIP House Counsel

3230 W Commercial Blvd, Suite 400

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Order Referring Case to Mediation

8/7/2019 - Order Referring Case to Mediation

Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

8/7/2019 - Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

Notice of Hearing By Judge

8/7/2019 - Notice of Hearing By Judge

Motion for Protective Order

12/7/2018 - Motion for Protective Order

Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

11/27/2018 - Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

Notice of Filing

8/16/2018 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing Affidavit

7/16/2018 - Notice of Filing Affidavit

Motion for Summary Judgment

7/8/2018 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

7/8/2018 - Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/17/2018 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/28/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

3/27/2018 - Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/10/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/10/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

9/5/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116035775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Referring Case to Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing By Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Protective Order; AND OBJECTION TO DUCES TECUM; Party: Defendant Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Party: Defendant Progressive American Insurance Company; Party: Attorney Hirshberg, Geoff, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Serving Proposal for Settlement; Party: Attorney Hirshberg, Geoff, ESQ.; Party: Defendant Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 80 Levine, Olga; Location: West Courtroom 220; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516; Party: Defendant Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JOHN C DALY JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021445; Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN C DALY JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021445; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less