Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 15:56:29 (UTC).

Associates in Family Practice of Broward LLC Plaintiff vs. Standard Fire Insurance Company (THE) Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 Associates in Family Practice of Broward LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Standard Fire Insurance Company THE Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1744

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Associates in Family Practice of Broward LLC

Estrada, Jordan

Defendant

Standard Fire Insurance Company (THE)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Poulopoulos, Theophilos G

Attorney at Schiller, Kessler, & Gomez PLC

7501 West Oakland Park Blvd, Second Floor

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33319

Defendant Attorney

Karr, Lowell P

Attorney at Cole, Scott, & Klssane, P.A.

600 N Pine Island Rd, Ste 500

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation

1/25/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

1/8/2019 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

12/13/2018 - Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

Order Granting Motion to Compel

10/31/2018 - Order Granting Motion to Compel

Amended Notice of Hearing

10/16/2018 - Amended Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

8/28/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Compel

8/24/2018 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

6/21/2018 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

5/16/2018 - Privilege Log

Response to Request for Production

5/16/2018 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

5/16/2018 - Response to Request for Admissions

Motion for Extension of Time

4/16/2018 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Service on Ins Commissioner

3/26/2018 - Notice of Service on Ins Commissioner

Request for Admissions

2/2/2018 - Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

2/2/2018 - Request to Produce

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/2/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/2/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

5/2/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115778218

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum; 1/28/19 @ 1:00 CORP REP BY PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum; 1/28/19 @ 2:00 TREATING PHYSICIAN FOR JORDAN; Party: Plaintiff Associates in Family Practice of Broward LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service on Ins Commissioner; February 7, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service on Ins Commissioner; February 7, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: THEOPHILOS GEORGE POULOPOULOS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A017430; Amount: $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: THEOPHILOS GEORGE POULOPOULOS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A017430; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Standard Fire Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Associates in Family Practice of Broward LLC is a litigant