This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/10/2023 at 17:29:54 (UTC).

Arold Etienne Plaintiff vs. GA Telesis, LLC,, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Arold Etienne Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GA Telesis, LLC,, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Daniel A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6246

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Daniel A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Etienne, Arold

Defendants

GA Telesis, LLC,

Garcia Villarreal, Jorge Luis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wechsler, Ryan M., ESQ.

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

8/24/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

8/24/2021 - eSummons Issuance

Interrogatories & Notice of Service

8/24/2021 - Interrogatories & Notice of Service

Notice of Service of Interrogs

8/24/2021 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Production

8/24/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

8/24/2021 - Request for Production

Complaint (eFiled)

8/24/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

8/24/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

7/22/2022 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

7/21/2022 - Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

 

Docket Entries

07/22/2022
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition(s): Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 118291677

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2022

DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021

DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $100,001.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled); Additional Text; AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Party: Plaintiff Etienne, Arold

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request for Production; Additional Text; FIRST TO DEFENDANT, JORGE LUIS GARCIA VILLARREAL; Party: Plaintiff Etienne, Arold

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request for Production; Additional Text; FIRST TO DEFENDANT, GA TELESIS, LLC; Party: Plaintiff Etienne, Arold

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Interrogs; Additional Text; FIRST SET TO DEFENDANT, GA TELESIS, LLC; Party: Plaintiff Etienne, Arold

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Interrogatories & Notice of Service; Additional Text; FIRST SET TO DEFENDANT, JORGE LUIS GARCIA VILLARREAL; Party: Plaintiff Etienne, Arold

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant GA Telesis, LLC,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Garcia Villarreal, Jorge Luis

[+] Read More [-] Read Less