This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/27/2020 at 14:37:19 (UTC).

Anthony Marchese, et al Plaintiff vs. United Parcel Service Inc, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Anthony Marchese, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against United Parcel Service Inc, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levenson, Jeffrey R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5664

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levenson, Jeffrey R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marchese, Robin

Marchese, Anthony

Defendants

United Parcel Service Inc

Christopher, Keraliah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelley, Robert W

Attorney at Kelley / Uustal Trial Attorneys

500 N. Federal Highway, Suite 200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Video Deposition

9/23/2020 - Notice of Video Deposition

Request

9/23/2020 - Request

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

9/23/2020 - Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

9/23/2020 - Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

9/23/2020 - Request to Produce

Request to Produce

9/23/2020 - Request to Produce

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; KERALIAH CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Video Deposition; OF KERALIAH CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; FOR INSPECTION TO DEFENDANT, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Propounding Interrogatories; TO DEFENDANT KERALIAH CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Propounding Interrogatories; TO DEFENDANT, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANT KERALIAH CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANT, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; TO DEFENDANT KERALIAH CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; TO DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC

    Read MoreRead Less