This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:34:30 (UTC).

Anita Lewis Plaintiff vs. Albert Baldocchi Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Anita Lewis Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Albert Baldocchi Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Singer, Michele Towbin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5712

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Singer, Michele Towbin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lewis, Anita

Defendant

Baldocchi, Albert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schiffrin, Mark

Ste 303, 4600 Sheridan St

Hollywood, FL 33021-0000

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ALBERT BALDOCCHI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less