This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 19:24:55 (UTC).

Angelo Miele, Jr. Plaintiff vs. Amber Ball, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 Angelo Miele, Jr Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Amber Ball, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6859

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miele, Angelo, Jr.

Defendants

Ball, Amber

Hayward, Kimberly

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Costs

6/3/2020 - Affidavit of Costs

Verified Statement of Compliance with the CARES Act

6/3/2020 - Verified Statement of Compliance with the CARES Act

Civil Cover Sheet

6/3/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/3/2020 - Complaint

Summons Returned Served

6/8/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

6/8/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Answer to Tenant Eviction

6/12/2020 - Answer to Tenant Eviction

Motion

6/12/2020 - Motion

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

6/12/2020 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Motion for Default & Default

6/12/2020 - Motion for Default & Default

Non-Military Affidavit

6/12/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Order Denying

6/17/2020 - Order Denying

Order Referring Case to Mediation

6/17/2020 - Order Referring Case to Mediation

Notice of Filing

6/18/2020 - Notice of Filing

Motion for Order

6/18/2020 - Motion for Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Order; STRIKING PLEADINGS; Party: Plaintiff Miele, Angelo, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; PROOF OF SERVICE OF TERMINATION NOTICE; Party: Plaintiff Miele, Angelo, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Referring Case to Mediation; 06-16-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying; motion to determine rent (6/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketPleadings Sent Up To Judge; (Answer/ motion to determine rent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; Cnt1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; (To determine Rent ); Party: Defendant Ball, Amber

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Tenant Eviction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; POSTED 06/04/2020; Party: Defendant Hayward, Kimberly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; POSTED 06/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued to Process Server; Party: Defendant Ball, Amber

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued to Process Server; Party: Defendant Hayward, Kimberly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; FOR TENANT EVICTION; Party: Plaintiff Miele, Angelo, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Statement of Compliance with the CARES Act; Party: Plaintiff Miele, Angelo, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Costs; , NON-PAYMENT OF RENT AND NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT; Party: Defendant Ball, Amber; Party: Defendant Hayward, Kimberly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less