This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:13:51 (UTC).

Andrea Conrado Plaintiff vs. Juan Carlos Lopez Rios Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Andrea Conrado Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Juan Carlos Lopez Rios Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowman, John B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5685

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bowman, John B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conrado, Andrea

Defendant

Lopez Rios, Juan Carlos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Levine, Glen Barry

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ANIDJAR & LEVINE, P.A

300 Se 17St

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33316

Workman, Devon Kenneth

Attorney at The Law Offices of Anidjar & Levine

300 Se 17Th St

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316-2550

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Service of Interrogs

9/23/2020 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Production

9/23/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Lopez Rios, Juan Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; Party: Plaintiff Conrado, Andrea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Party: Plaintiff Conrado, Andrea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Conrado, Andrea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Conrado, Andrea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less