This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 15:51:02 (UTC).

Anchor Water Damage Restoration Inc Plaintiff vs. Castle Key Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Anchor Water Damage Restoration Inc Plaintiff filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Castle Key Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1036

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anchor Water Damage Restoration Inc

Browne, Farris

Defendant

Castle Key Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mineo, Peter, Jr.

Attorney at The Mineo Salcedo Law Firm PA

5600 Davie Road

Davie, FL 33314

Defendant Attorney

Zuckerman, Evan A

Attorney at Vernis & Bowling of Broward, P.A.

5821 Hollywood Blvd

Hollywood, FL 33021

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation

10/15/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Hearing

9/23/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Motion

9/17/2019 - Motion

Response to Request for Production

9/16/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

9/16/2019 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Protective Order

8/19/2019 - Motion for Protective Order

Notice of Hearing

7/31/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Request for Admissions

7/18/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogs

7/18/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Response

12/21/2018 - Response

Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories

11/17/2018 - Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories

Notice of Unavailability

11/17/2018 - Notice of Unavailability

Order

5/14/2018 - Order

Notice of Hearing

4/3/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Motion for Protective Order

3/20/2018 - Motion for Protective Order

Civil Cover Sheet

1/16/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

1/16/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Request to Produce

1/16/2018 - Request to Produce

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; TO HAVE REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S CONTENTION INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Castle Key Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: PETER J. MINEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007155; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: PETER J. MINEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007155; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANCHOR WATER DAMAGE RESTORATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Castle Key Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zuckerman, Evan A