This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 19:06:16 (UTC).

American Express Centurion Bank Corporation Plaintiff vs. Joel B Jacob Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 American Express Centurion Bank Corporation Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Joel B Jacob Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1885

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express Centurion Bank Corporation

Defendant

Jacob, Joel B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Modlin, Scott Eric

Attorney at Modlin Slinsky PA

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway, Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service

5/9/2018 - Notice of Service

Affidavit of Indebtedness

4/26/2018 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Affidavit of Costs

4/26/2018 - Affidavit of Costs

Non-Military Affidavit

4/26/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default Final Judgment

4/26/2018 - Motion for Default Final Judgment

Notice

4/16/2018 - Notice

Motion for Default

4/9/2018 - Motion for Default

Default

4/9/2018 - Default

Non-Military Affidavit

4/9/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Summons Returned Served

3/13/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Civil Cover Sheet

2/9/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

2/9/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

2/9/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Default Final Judgment

5/1/2018 - Default Final Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Final Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115045828

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Indebtedness; Party: Plaintiff American Express Centurion Bank Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Costs; Party: Plaintiff American Express Centurion Bank Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Final Judgment; Party: Plaintiff American Express Centurion Bank Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; OF PLAINTIFF'S NAME CHANGE TO AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; Party: Plaintiff American Express Centurion Bank Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; March 8, 2018; Party: Defendant Jacob, Joel B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SCOTT E MODLIN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A020842; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: SCOTT E MODLIN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A020842; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric