This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 17:50:26 (UTC).

American Express Centurion Bank Corporation Plaintiff vs. James W Spirling Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/06/2018 American Express Centurion Bank Corporation Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against James W Spirling Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1827

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express Centurion Bank Corporation

Defendants

Spirling, James W

Spirling, James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Modlin, Scott Eric

Attorney at Modlin Slinsky PA

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway, Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

Morneault, Mitchell

Attorney at Modlin & Associates, P.A.

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway, Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment

10/15/2018 - Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment

Continuing Writ of Garnishment Returned Served

8/23/2018 - Continuing Writ of Garnishment Returned Served

Contin Writ Garn & Req Procedure Forms

8/10/2018 - Contin Writ Garn & Req Procedure Forms

Answer of Garnishee

7/13/2018 - Answer of Garnishee

Notice of Garnishment

7/11/2018 - Notice of Garnishment

Motion for Garnishment After Judgment

7/5/2018 - Motion for Garnishment After Judgment

Motion for Default Final Judgment

6/4/2018 - Motion for Default Final Judgment

Non-Military Affidavit

6/4/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit of Costs

6/4/2018 - Affidavit of Costs

Affidavit of Indebtedness

6/4/2018 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Non-Military Affidavit

5/9/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Default

5/9/2018 - Default

Motion for Default

5/9/2018 - Motion for Default

Notice

4/9/2018 - Notice

Summons Returned Served

3/30/2018 - Summons Returned Served

eSummons Issuance

2/6/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

2/6/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Default Final Judgment

6/11/2018 - Default Final Judgment

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal of Garnishment; Trrillium Sales Group USA Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal of Garnishment; JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Garnishment to Defendant; TRILLIUM SALES GROUP USA INC - Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketContinuing Writ of Garnishment Returned Served; 8/22/2018-Trillium Slaes Group USA Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCC/TC of Continuing Garnishment W/Req Forms Issd; to atty/mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketContin Writ Garn & Req Procedure Forms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment; Trillium Sales Group USA, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketWrit Fee; Payor: SCOTT MODLIN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A106407; Amount: $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer of Garnishee; JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Garnishment; JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default; Party: Plaintiff American Express Centurion Bank Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; OF PLAINTIFF'S NAME CHANGE TO AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; Party: Plaintiff American Express Centurion Bank Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; March 22, 2018; Party: Defendant Spirling, James W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: SCOTT E MODLIN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A018865; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SCOTT E MODLIN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A018865; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric