This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 20:49:27 (UTC).

Alliance Spine & Joint II Inc Plaintiff vs. Geico General Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 Alliance Spine Joint II Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2312

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alliance Spine & Joint II Inc

Perez, Juan Munoz

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daly, John C, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of John C. Daly PA

8551 W. Sunrise Blvd., Ste#304

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

Cimballa, George L, III

Attorney at Attn: PIP Department

6700 North Andrews Avenue, Suite 404

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Answer to Interrogs

1/6/2020 - Answer to Interrogs

Notice of Change of Address

1/2/2020 - Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

12/21/2019 - Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Appearance

10/30/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Answer to Interrogs

8/15/2019 - Answer to Interrogs

Response to Request for Admissions

8/15/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

8/2/2019 - Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

8/2/2019 - Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogs

8/2/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Motion for Extension of Time

7/29/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

7/25/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Appearance

7/3/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

7/3/2019 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Production

7/3/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Privilege Log

7/3/2019 - Privilege Log

Notice of Service of Interrogs

6/26/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Production

6/26/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Filing

6/26/2019 - Notice of Filing

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Interrogs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Party: Attorney Cimballa, George L, III; Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE; Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Interrogs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A062112; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 82 DePrimo, Natasha; Location: West Courtroom 260

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A018711; Amount: $55.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A018711; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alliance Spine & Joint I Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George L Cimballa