This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 18:56:34 (UTC).

Alliance Spine & Joint I Inc Plaintiff vs. Government Employees Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 Alliance Spine Joint I Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Government Employees Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1874

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alliance Spine & Joint I Inc

Misas, Elizabeth

Defendant

Government Employees Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daly, John C, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of John C. Daly PA

8551 W. Sunrise Blvd., Ste#304

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

Abualown, Lubna

6700 North Andrews Avenue, Ste 404

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Production

4/25/2018 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

4/25/2018 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

4/25/2018 - Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/16/2018 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Request for Admissions

4/2/2018 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

4/2/2018 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/2/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Taking Deposition

4/2/2018 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Filing

4/2/2018 - Notice of Filing

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/26/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/8/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/8/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

8/13/2018 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115258576

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 83 Feld, Ellen; Location: West Courtroom 240; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN C DALY JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A020362; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JOHN C DALY JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A020362; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alliance Spine & Joint I Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abualown, Lubna