This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 16:16:59 (UTC).

Alliabcw Spine & Joint II Inc Plaintiff vs. Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 Alliabcw Spine Joint II Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1754

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alliabcw Spine & Joint II Inc

Suros, Patricia

Defendant

Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Poulopoulos, Theophilos G

Attorney at Schiller, Kessler, & Gomez PLC

7501 West Oakland Park Blvd, Second Floor

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33319

Defendant Attorney

Silvanic, Benjamin W

Attorney at Lawrence D. Popritkin, P.A.

11555 Heron Bay Blvd, Suite 100A

Coral Springs, FL 33076

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/2/2018 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

4/2/2018 - Response to Request for Admissions

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/27/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

3/26/2018 - Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

Notice of Appearance

3/21/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

3/21/2018 - Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

Request for Admissions

2/2/2018 - Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

2/2/2018 - Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogs

2/2/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/2/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/2/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

7/20/2018 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115212733

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; FIRST REQUEST; Party: Defendant Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 83 Feld, Ellen; Location: West Courtroom 240; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served; Monday, February 12, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure; Party: Defendant Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: THEOPHILOS GEORGE POULOPOULOS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A017538; Amount: $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: THEOPHILOS GEORGE POULOPOULOS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A017538; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silvanic, Benjamin W