This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/09/2020 at 13:22:17 (UTC).

All County Remediation Inc Plaintiff vs. Marc Gutterman Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 All County Remediation Inc Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Marc Gutterman Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Di Pietro, Nina W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2297

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Di Pietro, Nina W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

All County Remediation Inc

All County DKI

Defendant

Gutterman, Marc

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1949

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moraitis, Robert J

Attorney at Moraitis & Raimondi, LLP

1310 Se 3Rd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Defendant Attorney

Gutterman, Marc Jason

Attorney at Gutterman Trial Group

200 East Boward Boulevard, Suite 1630

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1949

 

Court Documents

Stipulation for Dismissal

1/29/2020 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Satisfaction of Lien

1/29/2020 - Satisfaction of Lien

Notice of Cancellation

10/14/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Motion for Protective Order

10/11/2019 - Motion for Protective Order

Notice of Appearance

9/24/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

9/24/2019 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Motion for Extension of Time

9/24/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Taking Deposition

9/24/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Filing

9/17/2019 - Notice of Filing

Order Granting Exparte Motion to Effectuate Service

6/18/2019 - Order Granting Exparte Motion to Effectuate Service

eSummons Issuance - Alias

6/11/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Alias

Notice of Hearing

6/5/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Motion for Extension of Time

5/21/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice

5/21/2019 - Notice

eSummons Issuance

1/16/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

1/16/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Lis Pendens

1/16/2019 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet

1/16/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Dismissal; STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction of Lien; DISCHARGE AND SATISFACTION OF LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Protective Order; Party: Plaintiff All County Remediation Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Exparte Motion to Effectuate Service; (6/18/19)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Alias

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO SERVE DEFENDANT MARC GUTTERMAN WITH SERVICE OF PROCESS; Party: Plaintiff All County Remediation Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; OF FILING VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE (Unserved); Party: Plaintiff All County Remediation Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: MORAITIS RAIMONDI LLP ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A011209; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MORAITIS RAIMONDI LLP ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A011209; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Fld & Rec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less