This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 12/06/2020 at 16:47:53 (UTC).

ALL AMERICAN INSURANCE CONSULTANTS INC Plaintiff vs. ELDAR ALIEV MATA Defendant

Case Summary

On 10/02/2016 ALL AMERICAN INSURANCE CONSULTANTS INC Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against ELDAR ALIEV MATA Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hurley, John. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8127

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hurley, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL AMERICAN INSURANCE CONSULTANTS INC

Defendant

ALIEV MATA, ELDAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Treusch, Andy

 

Court Documents

Final Order of Dismissal

11/6/2018 - Final Order of Dismissal

Civil Cover Sheet

10/2/2016 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

10/2/2016 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

10/7/2016 - Complaint (eFiled)

Return of Service Served

11/24/2016 - Return of Service Served

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

12/7/2016 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice

1/9/2017 - Notice

Order Setting Case Management Conference

3/8/2017 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Motion to Withdraw

7/19/2017 - Motion to Withdraw

Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

7/28/2017 - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

County - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

7/10/2018 - County - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Order of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCounty - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion to Withdraw; as counsel for defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw; AS COUNSEL FOR ELDAR ALIEV MATA WITH CLIENT CONSENT; Party: Defendant ALIEV MATA, ELDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; AND IMPOSING TIME LIMITATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; FOR TRIAL; Party: Plaintiff ALL AMERICAN INSURANCE CONSULTANTS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant ALIEV MATA, ELDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Served; 11/17/16; Party: Defendant ALIEV MATA, ELDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2016
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ANDY TREUSCH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A140199; Amount: $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ANDY TREUSCH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A140199; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less