This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 14:22:52 (UTC).

Alison Grove, et al Plaintiff vs. Claudia Fuller Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Alison Grove, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Claudia Fuller Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5748

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Grove, Zachary

Grove, Alison

Defendant

Fuller, Claudia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heller, Joshua L, ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Berman & Berman PA

Post Office Box 272789

Boca Raton, FL 33427

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

9/23/2020 - Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

Request to Produce

9/23/2020 - Request to Produce

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Grove, Alison; Party: Plaintiff Grove, Zachary; Party: Plaintiff Heller, Joshua L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANT, CLAUDIA FULLER; Party: Plaintiff Grove, Alison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Propounding Interrogatories; TO DEFENDANT, CLAUDIA FULLER; Party: Plaintiff Grove, Alison; Party: Plaintiff Grove, Zachary; Party: Plaintiff Heller, Joshua L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; FIRST TO DEFENDANT, CLAUDIA FULLER; Party: Plaintiff Grove, Alison; Party: Plaintiff Grove, Zachary; Party: Plaintiff Heller, Joshua L.

    Read MoreRead Less