This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/08/2020 at 16:16:54 (UTC).

Alice Acosta Plaintiff vs. FL HUD Margate LLC, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Alice Acosta Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against FL HUD Margate LLC, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Singer, Michele Towbin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8719

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Singer, Michele Towbin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Acosta, Alice

Defendants

FL HUD Margate LLC

Gulf Coast Health Care Inc

HUD Facilities LLC

 

Court Documents

Subpoena Issued By Attorney

1/28/2020 - Subpoena Issued By Attorney

Subpoena Issued By Attorney

1/28/2020 - Subpoena Issued By Attorney

Subpoena Issued By Attorney

1/28/2020 - Subpoena Issued By Attorney

Notice of Mediation

12/12/2019 - Notice of Mediation

Request to Produce

11/27/2019 - Request to Produce

Request to Produce

11/27/2019 - Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogs

11/27/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Service

2/5/2019 - Notice of Service

Request to Produce

1/17/2019 - Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogs

1/17/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served

1/9/2019 - Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served

Notice of Unavailability

12/21/2018 - Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Service of Interrogs

12/18/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Service of Interrogs

12/18/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Service of Interrogs

12/18/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Service of Interrogs

12/18/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Civil Cover Sheet

12/12/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

12/12/2018 - eSummons Issuance

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena Issued By Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena Issued By Attorney; NATALEE-ANN EDWARDS, RN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena Issued By Attorney; on April 9, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena Issued By Attorney; / MARIE ETIENNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena Issued By Attorney; / JAIME MORENO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena Issued By Attorney; / FAY R. DAVIDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena Issued By Attorney; / SHELBA PIERRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena Issued By Attorney; NATALEE-ANN EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena Issued By Attorney; / BRIDGETTE M. EDWARDS SIMPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: SAMUEL YAFFA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A165387; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SAMUEL YAFFA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A165387; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SAMUEL YAFFA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A165387; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SAMUEL YAFFA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A165387; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Acosta, Alice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; GULF COAST HEALTH CARE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; HUD FACILITIES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; FL HUD MARGATE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HUD FACILITIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GULF COAST HEALTH CARE LLC is a litigant