This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 08:18:14 (UTC).

Advanced Restoration Inc Plaintiff vs. Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 Advanced Restoration Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Universal Property Casualty Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Powell, Jackie. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2639

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Powell, Jackie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Advanced Restoration Inc

Mainor, Michael

Defendant

Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Davich, David W

Attorney at Cohen Grossman, Attorneys at Law

350 N Lake Destiny Road Ste 300

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

4/15/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

4/15/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Waiver of Appearance At Pretrial

4/12/2019 - Waiver of Appearance At Pretrial

Notice of Settlement

4/11/2019 - Notice of Settlement

Notice of Filing

3/15/2019 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Appearance

3/15/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

3/4/2019 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

3/4/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Civil Cover Sheet

3/4/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Service of Interrogs

3/4/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Admissions

3/4/2019 - Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

3/4/2019 - Request to Produce

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

6/18/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115878325

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 61 Powell, Jackie; Location: South Courtroom 230

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; cps (04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; (04-14-2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance At Pretrial; ord required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Party: Plaintiff Advanced Restoration Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: HARVEY COHEN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A034000; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: HARVEY COHEN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A034000; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED RESTORATION GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davich, David William