This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/22/2020 at 13:28:10 (UTC).

Advanced Chiropractic and Medical Center Corp Plaintiff vs. MGA Insurance Company Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 Advanced Chiropractic and Medical Center Corp Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against MGA Insurance Company Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohen, Mardi Levey. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2833

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cohen, Mardi Levey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Advanced Chiropractic and Medical Center Corp

Gomez, Fernando

Defendant

MGA Insurance Company Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eikosidekas, Kathy

Attorney at Attn: Marks & Fleischer

303 Sw 6 St

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33315

Defendant Attorney

Smith, Ryan

Attorney at Kirwan, Spellacy, Danner, Watkins & Brownstein PA

200 South Andrews Avenue, 8Th Floor

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

8/12/2019 - Notice of Settlement

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

8/12/2019 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Motion for Attorney Fees

6/12/2019 - Motion for Attorney Fees

Notice of Filing

4/23/2019 - Notice of Filing

Response to Request for Admissions

4/18/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

4/18/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Motion for Extension of Time

3/25/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request for Admissions

3/22/2019 - Request for Admissions

Agreed Order Granting

3/21/2019 - Agreed Order Granting

Notice of Service of Interrogs

3/21/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Admissions

3/21/2019 - Request for Admissions

Reservation of Rights to Trial By Jury

3/20/2019 - Reservation of Rights to Trial By Jury

Notice of Appearance

3/20/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion

3/20/2019 - Motion

Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

3/20/2019 - Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion for Extension of Time

3/20/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

eSummons Issuance

1/21/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

1/21/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116038606

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Party: Defendant MGA Insurance Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees; and Costs; Party: Defendant MGA Insurance Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS; Party: Plaintiff Advanced Chiropractic and Medical Center Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant MGA Insurance Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant MGA Insurance Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Defendant MGA Insurance Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Insurance Commissioner Returned Served; 03/05/2019 - No Summons Attached ; Party: Defendant MGA Insurance Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: AMIR FLEISCHER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A014469; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: AMIR FLEISCHER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A014469; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less