This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 07/04/2023 at 07:59:27 (UTC).

Admira Budd, et al Plaintiff vs. Kennedy De Souza Matos, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 Admira Budd, Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kennedy De Souza Matos, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levenson, Jeffrey R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0681

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levenson, Jeffrey R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Budd, Admira

Budd, Brian

Defendants

Souza Santana, Paulo

De Souza Matos, Kennedy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frachtman, Joshua David

Schwebel, Michael L, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

2/1/2022 - Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

1/14/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

Notice of Service

12/9/2021 - Notice of Service

Mediation Report

12/8/2021 - Mediation Report

Certificate

11/24/2021 - Certificate

Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)

11/22/2021 - Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)

Summons Returned Served

1/4/2021 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

1/4/2021 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

12/18/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

12/10/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Notice of Dismissal

8/8/2022 - Notice of Dismissal

Final Order of Dismissal

4/6/2022 - Final Order of Dismissal

Stipulation for Dismissal

4/5/2022 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Civil Cover Sheet

12/9/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

12/9/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

12/9/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

12/9/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

12/9/2020 - eSummons Issuance

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/08/2022
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition(s): Notice of Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 2; Instrument Number: 118325605

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022

DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition(s): Final Order of Dismissal; Comment (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 2; Instrument Number: 118064264

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition(s): Stipulation for Dismissal; Comment (WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 118058654

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Mediation Report

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Certificate; Additional Text; CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY; Party: Defendant Progressive Select Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351); Additional Text; RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Party: Plaintiff Budd, Admira

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
01/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request for Production

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; 12-30-2020; Party: Defendant Souza Santana, Paulo

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; 12-30-2020; Party: Defendant De Souza Matos, Kennedy

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; December 11, 2020 at 4: 06pm; Party: Defendant Progressive Select Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; Additional Text; NONE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $100,001.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; KENNEDY DE SOUZA MATOS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; PAULO SOUZA SANTANA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less