This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 20:53:49 (UTC).

Accident Care Clinic, Inc. Plaintiff vs. Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co. Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 Accident Care Clinic, Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3312

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Accident Care Clinic, Inc.

Foreo, Ana R

Defendant

Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barber, Matthew C, ESQ.

Attorney at Matthew C Barber PA

8551 W Sunrise Blvd #304

Plantation, FL 33322-4007

Defendant Attorney

Mangeney, Agust William

11555 Heron Bay Blvd, Ste 100A

Coral Springs, FL 33076

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Discovery

8/22/2019 - Motion to Compel Discovery

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

7/16/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Exhibits

6/25/2019 - Exhibits

Motion

6/25/2019 - Motion

Exhibits

6/25/2019 - Exhibits

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

6/25/2019 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

6/25/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing Deposition

4/15/2019 - Notice of Filing Deposition

Request for Production

4/15/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/15/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Admissions

4/15/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing

4/15/2019 - Notice of Filing

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/27/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

3/27/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

3/27/2019 - Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/22/2019 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/22/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery; RESPONSES; Party: Plaintiff Accident Care Clinic, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits; "A"; Party: Defendant Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; FOR RELIEF FROM TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS; Party: Defendant Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; FIRST REQUEST; Party: Defendant Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 81 Francois, Phoebee; Location: West Courtroom 260; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure; AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Party: Defendant Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A029328; Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A029328; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accident Care Clinic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AUGUST MANGENEY