This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 02:31:47 (UTC).

ACCELERATED INVENTORY MANAGEMENT, LLC Plaintiff vs. NERLANDE VINCENT Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 ACCELERATED INVENTORY MANAGEMENT, LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NERLANDE VINCENT Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cawthon, Corey Amanda. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6884

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cawthon, Corey Amanda

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCELERATED INVENTORY MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

VINCENT, NERLANDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rahnavard, Ali Robert

Attorney at O&L Law Group, P.L.

110 W Columbus Dr

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

Wieder, Seth, ESQ.

Attorney at The Law Offices Of Shaya Markovic P A

1221 S 21St Ave

Hollywood, FL 33020-6936

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

11/10/2022 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

11/10/2022 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

11/10/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

11/24/2022 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Summons Served - Substitute Service

12/19/2022 - Summons Served - Substitute Service

Order of Reassignment

12/27/2022 - Order of Reassignment

Agreed Order

12/27/2022 - Agreed Order

Waiver of Appearance At Pretrial

12/27/2022 - Waiver of Appearance At Pretrial

Request for Discovery

12/27/2022 - Request for Discovery

Answer to Complaint

12/27/2022 - Answer to Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

12/27/2022 - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Appearance

12/27/2022 - Notice of Appearance

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 61 Cawthon, Corey Amanda; Location: South Courtroom 230; CANCELED: Per Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant VINCENT, NERLANDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Demand for Jury Trial; Additional Text; Party: Defendant VINCENT, NERLANDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer to Complaint; Additional Text; Party: Defendant VINCENT, NERLANDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request for Discovery; Additional Text; Party: Defendant VINCENT, NERLANDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of Appearance At Pretrial; Additional Text; (Order Req'd)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Agreed Order; Additional Text; AGREED ORDER WAIVING PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 12/28/22 (12-27-22)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order of Reassignment; Additional Text; The Clerk of Courts is hereby directed to transfer this case to the Central Courthouse for a JURY trial (12-27-22)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Served - Substitute Service; Additional Text; 12-08-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less