This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/13/2019 at 13:30:39 (UTC).

WHISPERING OAKS HOUSING PARTNE VS SLOCUM, LATINA

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 WHISPERING OAKS HOUSING PARTNE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SLOCUM, LATINA. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVIS, D TATUM and D TATUM DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVIS, D TATUM

D TATUM DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHISPERING OAKS HOUSING PARTNE

Defendant

SLOCUM, LATINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTLING, DALE GREGORY

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR RELEASE OF REGISTRY FUNDS

09/09/2019:ORDER FOR RELEASE OF REGISTRY FUNDS

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 9/23/19 @ 10AM

09/09/2019:ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 9/23/19 @ 10AM

ANSWER FILED AND RENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $1082 FOR AUG & SEPT

09/06/2019:ANSWER FILED AND RENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $1082 FOR AUG & SEPT

RECEIPT

09/06/2019:RECEIPT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/29/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

08/23/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS

08/20/2019:SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

08/20/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/20/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • Event HEARING scheduled on 9/23/2019 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge D TATUM DAVIS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR RELEASE OF REGISTRY FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 9/23/19 @ 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED AND RENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $1082 FOR AUG & SEPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Payment received: $1,109.00 Receipt Number M 13430219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $1,105.73 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $1,105.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 13429632

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Case 042019CC000424CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Event Date: 09/23/2019 10:00; Judge: DAVIS, D TATUM; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MX CHAMBERS 237

    Read MoreRead Less