This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/13/2019 at 13:31:04 (UTC).

WHISPERING OAKS HOUSING PARTNE VS JONES, DEANA

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 WHISPERING OAKS HOUSING PARTNE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JONES, DEANA. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHISPERING OAKS HOUSING PARTNE

Defendant

JONES, DEANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTLING, DALE GREGORY

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/29/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

08/23/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS

08/21/2019:SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/21/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

08/21/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 13429715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Case 042019CC000426CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less