This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 10/11/2019 at 13:30:40 (UTC).

WHISPERING OAKS HOUSING PARTNE VS BUSTERNA, KAITLIN

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 WHISPERING OAKS HOUSING PARTNE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BUSTERNA, KAITLIN. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHISPERING OAKS HOUSING PARTNE

Defendant

BUSTERNA, KAITLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTLING, DALE GREGORY

 

Court Documents

MTN FOR DEFAULT , DEFAULT JUDGMENT & NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

10/10/2019:MTN FOR DEFAULT , DEFAULT JUDGMENT & NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

DEFAULT (UNSIGNED)

10/10/2019:DEFAULT (UNSIGNED)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/17/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

09/17/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: KAITLIN BUSTERNA ON 9/27/19

10/10/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: KAITLIN BUSTERNA ON 9/27/19

SUMMONS

09/17/2019:SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/30/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

09/19/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: KAITLIN BUSTERNA ON 9/27/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT (UNSIGNED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MTN FOR DEFAULT , DEFAULT JUDGMENT & NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 13430680

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Case 042019CC000467CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.