This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/13/2019 at 16:30:12 (UTC).

WHEELER, KIMBERLY CRAWFORD VS WHEELER, JOSEPH S

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 WHEELER, KIMBERLY CRAWFORD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WHEELER, JOSEPH S. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WHEELER, KIMBERLY CRAWFORD

Respondent

WHEELER, JOSEPH S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • Judge: KREIDER , DAVID P Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JOSEPH STEFAN WHEELER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED JASON WHEELER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT SHORT FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CHILDREN BORN/NOT BORN DURING MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED/DISCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS/APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Case 042019DR000434DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less