This case was last updated from Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/14/2019 at 14:30:26 (UTC).

VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANC VS BOX, MANDY Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BOX, MANDY. This case was filed in Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANC

Defendants

POSSESSION, THE UNKNOWN TENANT

BOX, R M

BOX, THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF R M

BOX, THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MAN

PADGETT, DONNA

BOX, MANDY

BOX, ROBIN

PADGETT, THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF

BOX, THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROB

WALKER, THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF

WALKER, DIANE KING

Not Classified By Court

BOX, RANDOLPH M

BOX AKA MICHAEL BOX, RANDOLPH

PADGETT, DONNA B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMALBACH, HARRISON SAMUEL

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

03/06/2019:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

02/26/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY SMALBACH AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN PADGETT LAW GROUP

02/21/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY SMALBACH AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN PADGETT LAW GROUP

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE ROBIN BOX

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE ROBIN BOX

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RANDOLPH M BOX

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RANDOLPH M BOX

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MANDY BOX

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MANDY BOX

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DIANE KING WALKER

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DIANE KING WALKER

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DONNA PADGETT AKA DONNA B PADGETT

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DONNA PADGETT AKA DONNA B PADGETT

SUMMONS ISSUED R M BOX AKA RANDOLPH M BOX AKA MICHAEL BOX

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED R M BOX AKA RANDOLPH M BOX AKA MICHAEL BOX

SUMMONS ISSUED ROBIN BOX

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED ROBIN BOX

SUMMONS ISSUED MANDY BOX

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED MANDY BOX

SUMMONS ISSUED DIANE KING WALKER

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIANE KING WALKER

SUMMONS ISSUED DONNA PADGETT AKA DONNA B PADGETT

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DONNA PADGETT AKA DONNA B PADGETT

SUMMONS

02/18/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

02/18/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

02/18/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

02/18/2019:SUMMONS

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY SMALBACH AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN PADGETT LAW GROUP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE ROBIN BOX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RANDOLPH M BOX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MANDY BOX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DIANE KING WALKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DONNA PADGETT AKA DONNA B PADGETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED R M BOX AKA RANDOLPH M BOX AKA MICHAEL BOX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSOIN OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $527.00 Receipt Number M 13422088

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $527.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $527.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketCase 042019CA000089CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Box, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANCE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMALBACH, HARRISON